Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Taj Kettrles, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Asher, Roberta D, against Exotic Hair Inc, Marcelino Feliciano, Maria Feliciano, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Kings Djmp1 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKings Djmp1 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 6/15/2023 nsp. |
||
June 27, 2023 | DECISION / ORDER OF JHO/REFEREE | ||
December 16, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) NOE - order dated 11-30-22 GRANTING P motion for default - COMPLETE COPY |
||
December 16, 2022 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY note of issue |
||
December 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A exhibit A to NOI - order dated 11-30-22 GRANTING P motion for default |
||
December 16, 2022 |
PROOF OF SERVICE AOS of NOI |
||
December 05, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Order dated 11/30/22 |
||
July 13, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) affidavit in support of P motion for default |
||
July 13, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) affirmation in support of P motion for default |
||
July 13, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for default judgment and legal back |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.