Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
David K. Timothy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Belushin, Vel, against John Ramos, Yineiry Guzman, represented by Gradowitz, Sean Andrew, Reinstein, Richard Adam, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Robin Garson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin Garson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 07, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition |
||
June 06, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Notice of Entry with Order |
||
May 09, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Preliminary Conference Order |
||
May 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR Police Report Redacted |
||
May 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Summons & Complaint |
||
May 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2) Affirmation of Good Faith |
||
May 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Defendants ' Answer |
||
May 02, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support of MOtion |
||
May 02, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.