Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Maria Idrovo, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Doiron, Kurt Andreas, against New York City Police Officers "John Does" 1-100, New York City Police Officers "John Does" 1-100, New York Police Department, The City Of New York, represented by , Counsel, Corporation, Parab, Amit, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Kings Cdp22 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKings Cdp22 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Wrongful Arrest) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 11, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 05, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 24, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 24, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 27, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 17, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 01, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 01, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 04, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated: September 28, 2022 |
||
September 27, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 05, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 01, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 01, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
September 17, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
June 24, 2021 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Defendant New York City Police Department |
||
June 24, 2021 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Defendant The City of New York |
||
June 24, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 11, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.