Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Arlette Olivo, Henry Rodriguez-Bueno, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kessler, Jason B, against Aleksandr Peysakhov, Dzhulyeta Peysakhova, represented by Gruber, Teresa Ann, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Robin Garson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin Garson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 08, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 12, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: July 22, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 04, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 12, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 19, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 04, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated 4/4/22 |
||
April 04, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) CCO (PROPOSED TO BE SO ORDERED) |
||
April 04, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed CC Order |
||
September 08, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 12, 2021 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS PLAINTIFF BILL OF PARTICULARS |
||
August 12, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 22, 2021 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
July 19, 2021 | Answer.Demands | ||
June 11, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.