Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Anthony Dyer, Barbara-Ann Dyer, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Khashmati, Lyaman F., Sacks, Evan, against 886 Broadway Llc, Blustone Contracting Llc, represented by Bhargava, Anuradha, Kalin, John Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Karen B Rothenberg presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren B Rothenberg Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 28, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 05, 2022ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: May 05, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2021SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: July 01, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 26, 2022THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 26, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 05, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 31, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 29, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 11, 2022ANSWER
Date: May 19, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 18, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
May 19, 2022 |
ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER TO THIRD-PARTY INTERNATIONAL CONCRETE CORP.'S CROSS-CLAIMS |
||
May 18, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated: 05/11/2022 |
||
May 11, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
May 05, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demands for Bills of Particulars and Initial Discovery Demands |
||
May 05, 2022 |
ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Verified Answer to Third-Party Complaint with Cross-Claims and Counterclaim |
||
April 29, 2022 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer |
||
February 24, 2022 |
PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL SERVICE FOR INTERNATIONAL CONCRETE CORP. |
||
February 14, 2022 |
PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO INTERNATIONAL CONCRETE CORP. VIA THE SECRETARY OF STATE |
||
January 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D CERTIFICATE OF INSURANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.