Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ark393 Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Anderson, Jeffrey Robert, Goffe, Trusha Patel, Shaikh, Nahid Aftab, against Diocese Of Brooklyn A K A The Roman Catholic Diocese Of Brooklyn, New York, Diocese Of Brooklyn A K A The Roman Catholic Diocese Of Brooklyn, New York, Does 1-5 Whose Identities Are Unknown To Plaintiff, Holy Family, represented by Peknic, Charles Martin, Scahill, Francis J, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Laurence L. Love presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurence L. Love Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 11, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 14, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2022 | Answer and Notice to Take Deposition | ||
July 10, 2022 |
ORDER - AMENDED Second Amended Confidentiality Order July 6, 2022. |
||
May 13, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
May 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 13, 2022 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
May 13, 2022 | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | ||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit D to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Plaintiffs) |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit E to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Defendants) |
||
July 07, 2021 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) So ordered stipulation attached |
||
June 28, 2021 |
STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #1) Stipulation Resolving Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.