Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
Iruka Capital Group Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Greenfield, Isaac Hirsch, Zachter, Jeffrey S, against Jr& B Associates Llc D B A Jr&B Associates, Randall L Simms, represented by Barr, Trevor James, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Carolyn E. Wade presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn E. Wade Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 04, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 18, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 16, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 18, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 7/15/23 |
||
April 12, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Plaintiff's Exhibit D - Payment History 2 |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Plaintiff's Exhibit C - Merchant Agreement 2 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiff's Exhibit C - Merchant Agreement 2 Redacted |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Plaintiff's Exhibit B - Payment History 1 |
||
March 17, 2023 |
NOTICE TO ADMIT Plaintiff's Notice to Admit |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Plaintiff's Exhibit A - Merchant Agreement 1 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiff's Exhibit A - Merchant Agreement 1 Redacted |
||
March 14, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition |
||
March 14, 2023 |
NOTICE TO ADMIT Plaintiff's Notice to Admit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.