Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cit Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against 1761 Rockaway Associates Llc, Albert Edward As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Dorothy U. Jordan If Living, And If She He Be Dead, Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim To Have An Interest In, Or General Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action; Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In The Following Designation, Namely:, Blanche Wier As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Dorothy U. Jordan If Living, And If She He Be Dead, Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim To Have An Interest In, Or General Or Specific Lien Upon Upon The Real Property Described In This Action; Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In The Following Designation, Criminal Court Of The City Of New York, Dorothy U. Jordan, (total of 18) See All represented by Alter, Bernard Mitchell, Arnott, Maria Anna, Barbaro, Stephen Vincent, Cappellano, Edward Louis, Dale, Dominick R., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Cenceria Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCenceria Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Albert Edward As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Dorothy U. Jordan If Living, And If She He Be Dead, Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim To Have An Interest In, Or General Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action; Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In The Following Designation, Namely:
Blanche Wier As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Dorothy U. Jordan If Living, And If She He Be Dead, Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim To Have An Interest In, Or General Or Specific Lien Upon Upon The Real Property Described In This Action; Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In The Following Designation
John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint
Patricia Winter As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Dorothy U. Jordan If Living, And If She He Be Dead, Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim To Have An Interest In, Or General Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action; Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In The Following Designation
Phillip Neale As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Dorothy U. Jordan; Unknown Heirs And Distributees Of The Estate Of Dorothy U. Jordan, Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim To Have An Interest In, Or General Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action; Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In The Following Designation, Namely:
Tony Edwards As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Dorothy U. Jordan If Living, And If She He Be Dead, Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim To Have An Interest In, Or General Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action; Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In The Following Designation, Namely:
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 29, 2016ANSWER
Date: August 17, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 19, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 24, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 10, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 01, 2020NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 01, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 24, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 19, 2017ANSWER
Date: August 24, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 19, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 24, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 24, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 24, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 13, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 13, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 29, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2016NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 29, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 19, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 29, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 19, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Reverse Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) Hud Approval Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1) Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 24, 2017NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 19, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2) Non-Military Affidavit
Date: December 19, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1) Certificate of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5) AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: March 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5) AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5) AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE
Date: February 18, 2020ANSWER
Date: August 09, 2022OATH
Date: August 22, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 24, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 07, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 18, 2020SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: July 19, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: July 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 18, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: September 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: September 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: November 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 01, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 13, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: January 26, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: May 23, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: May 01, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 29, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: June 15, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 24, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
June 15, 2023 | NOTIFICATION FROM COURT | ||
May 23, 2023 | NOTIFICATION FROM COURT | ||
May 01, 2023 | NOTIFICATION FROM COURT | ||
January 26, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES NOP and Demand for Surplus Monies |
||
January 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
November 15, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES | ||
October 21, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE S&C MAILING-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE |
||
October 21, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.