Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee Of The Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2007-A5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-E Under The Pooling And Servicing Agreement Dated March 1, 2007, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Wallace, Lisa L, against Antonio Bracale, Consiglia Bracale A K A Consiglia Rita Bracale, John Doe #1 To John Doe #10 The Last 10 Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, Rosario Bracale, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Peter Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time201 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 15, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 16, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2016 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DTD 12/17/15 |
||
March 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) Conference Term 73 SO STD SIGNED 12/17/, 15 (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
December 10, 2015 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 10, 2015 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
December 10, 2015 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 02, 2015 | Hearing |
Not Settled - Unrepresented FORECLOSURE PRE-SETTLEMENT Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
November 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Continued FORECLOSURE PRE-SETTLEMENT Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
September 18, 2015 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
September 18, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD OCCUPANT |
||
September 18, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD DANNY DEVIVO S/H/A JOHN DOE # 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.