Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee Of The Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2006-A9Cb, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-I Under The Pooling And Servicing Agreement Dated July 1, 2006, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., Wallace, Lisa L, against Capital Quest, Llc, Criminal Court Of The City Of New York, Jessica Nieves, John Doe #1 To John Doe #10 The Last 10 Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Verified Complaint, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., As Nominee For Indymac Bank, F.S.B., (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Dear-For.Resolution Pt 1 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDear-For.Resolution Pt 1 Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions531 days |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time531 days |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1)
Date: August 11, 2017EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #00)
Date: November 16, 2016JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: February 08, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1) | |
July 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) For. Resolution Part1-Motion NA DEFT (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
July 26, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) | |
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) | |
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) | |
June 21, 2017 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #001) Decided: 07/29/2017Granted Before Justice: Dear, Hon. Noach Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Judgment of Foreclosure & Sale |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.