Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Daniel Mechanic, Devorah Mechanic, Louis Zauderer, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Churgin, Joseph, against 90 North 5Th St. Llc, Aron Gertz, Judah Septimus, represented by Friedman, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Edgar G Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdgar G Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2015 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1356 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 14, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 27, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION *Corrected*
Date: August 28, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
February 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled - Other PART 90 STP/DISC:2/11/16, EFILED:2/11/16 (Conversion) Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
October 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 90 Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) 90 (PS) |
|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Septimus |
|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Gertz |
|
September 25, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) MOTION PART Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
September 10, 2015 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #001) Decided: 10/09/2015Withdrawn Before Justice: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) 90 North 5th (NYSDOS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.