Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Magdala Boule, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Andrews-Santillo, Ashley, Datikashvili, Jeffrey Bentsi, against Allan Shain, Morris Feldbrand As Trustee, Yocheved M. Shain, represented by Feinzeig, Jacob Solomon, Toomey, James J, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Martin M Solomon (Pt. 38) presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin M Solomon (Pt. 38) Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time469 days |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: August 27, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 13, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2019 |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 4/4/19 nsp. |
||
December 09, 2016 |
STIPULATION - OTHER AMENDED STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE |
||
December 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled - Other Trial Term 38 Judge: Solomon, Hon. Martin M. |
|
November 29, 2016 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuing Action with Prejudice |
||
October 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Solomon, Hon. Martin M. |
|
October 21, 2016 |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 10/20/16 |
||
October 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003) Motion Trial Term 38 Judge: Solomon, Hon. Martin M. |
|
October 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) Motion Trial Term 38 Judge: Solomon, Hon. Martin M. |
|
October 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) Motion Trial Term 38 Judge: Solomon, Hon. Martin M. |
|
October 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Motion Trial Term 38 Judge: Solomon, Hon. Martin M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.