Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Laurie A. Castaldo, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Schwartzapfel, Steven J., against Deanna C. Hennecken, represented by Shapiro, Adam Philip, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Richard Velasquez Pt 66 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Velasquez Pt 66 Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time494 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 30, 2016 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) NOTE OF ISSUE/NO APPEARANCE Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Richard |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 6/29/16 |
|
June 29, 2016 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Richard |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 10/29/15 filed CC 11/2/15 |
|
October 29, 2015 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Richard |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected* | |
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.