Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Meyriban Jafarova, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Dalton, Helen F., Viener, Joseph B, against Simon M. Nadulek, represented by Pugliese, Corey Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Edgar G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdgar G Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1418 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: November 21, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 22, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 24, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #4)
Date: January 17, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4)
Date: January 17, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: November 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)
Date: November 17, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: November 17, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: June 29, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: June 29, 2017ANSWER
Date: February 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
June 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Settled JURY COORDINATING PART 1 PICKED (Conversion) Judge: Kurtz, Hon. Donald Scott |
|
June 05, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 PICKING (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
June 04, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 PICKING (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
June 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 DSK-FNL (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
May 30, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 3SEL513 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
May 13, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 2SEL501 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
May 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 1SEL308 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
March 08, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 PRE-TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.