Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rose Altman, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rosenbaum, Craig Daniel, against Acadia 3780-3858 Nostrand Avenue Llc, Acadia Nostrand Avenue Llc, Nostrand Properties, Llc, Realty Equity Holdings 3820, Llc, represented by Bender, Heath A, Coviello, Jennifer Louise, Gallo, David A, Winter, Michael James, Wolthoff, John L, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Devin P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDevin P Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1071 days |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 07, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
April 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART NO NOI (Conversion) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Devin P. |
|
March 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART NO ORD (Conversion) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Devin P. |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
February 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE/NO APPEARANCE MOTION (Conversion) Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dated 12/15/17 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #009) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART GEXT (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
January 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #008) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART GSF (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #8) AFF IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION & PARTIAL OPP TO PLF MOTOION |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #9) NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.