Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nathan Hirsch A K A Nachum Hirsch, Individually And On Behalf Of Albest Metal Stamping Corp.,, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Heller, Gary M, against Alexander Fischer A K A Aron Fischer, Chaim Zvi Klagsbald, Rifka Falkowitz As Executors Of The Estate Of Jonas Witriol A K A Yonah Witriol And As Administrators Of The Estate Of Judith Witriol, Solomon Witriol A K A Shlomo Baruch Witriol, represented by Vider, Israel, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Wavny Toussaint presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWavny Toussaint Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time473 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 04, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: August 06, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 04, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Dismissed PRE-NOTE S & G PART - KNIPEL NAP (Conversion) Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Order date 2/10/2016 |
|
February 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Motion Term 70 FINAL (Conversion) Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
February 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Motion Term 70 SFO, FINAL (Conversion) Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
December 16, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Term 70 SFO (Conversion) Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
November 04, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Term 70 Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service |
|
September 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Motion Term 70 FINAL (Conversion) Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
September 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Term 70 Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING Stipulation of adjournment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.