Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Crepini Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Hamilton, Sherry S., Mcpartland, Patrick T, against Boris Tulman, Cooltech Mechanical Corp., Cooltech Mechanical Group, Inc., Eugene Tulman, Mikhail Tulman, (total of 9) See All represented by Darwin, David Lee, Muchmore, Andrew M, Travis, Maximilian Douglas, Young, Hayes, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Larry D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarry D Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1567 days |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: September 14, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 25, 2016EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: April 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2019 | Hearing |
Discontinued Commercial Part Conf 12 2:30PM (Conversion) Judge: Martin, Hon. Larry D. |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
August 16, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned COMMERCIAL PART 11 PRE-TRI 10AM (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
July 26, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned COMMERCIAL PART 11 PRE-TRI (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (confidentiality) dtd 5/28/2019 |
|
May 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned COMMERCIAL PART 11 PRE-TRI (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
March 28, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned COMMERCIAL PART 11 PRE-TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
November 01, 2018 | Hearing |
Referred COMMERCIAL PART 11 SC (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
August 14, 2018 | Hearing |
Held COMMERCIAL PART 11 Supreme Trial; SC (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.