Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Alyssa Jones, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Wiss, Scott Lawrence, against Catrena Magwood, Michael Washington, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Kurtz, Jcp presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKurtz, Jcp Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time963 days |
ANSWER
Date: October 22, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 22, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 25, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Settled JURY COORDINATING PART 1 1SE1222 (Conversion) Judge: Kurtz, Hon. Donald Scott |
|
December 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 PRE-TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
June 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Remand NOTE OF ISSUE/NO APPEARANCE Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
May 04, 2017 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
October 25, 2016 |
ORDER - OTHER granting summary judgment |
||
October 25, 2016 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 10/21/16 |
||
October 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 90 SFO (Conversion) Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
October 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
October 19, 2016 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION |
||
September 16, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 90 CONS (Conversion) Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.