Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jacob Otilus, Valery Pierre, Willy Boucher, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Davydov, Denis David, against Franklyn Arteaga, Sandra Smith, Shamren Trans Corp, represented by Chung, Suey Kay, Hader, Annette, Hung, Cynthia Wen-Tei, Moskovits, Ronit Z, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Landicino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLandicino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time1166 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 24, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 02, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2018 | Hearing |
Settled JURY COORDINATING PART 1 PRE-TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
September 12, 2018 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #005) Motion Term 81 SETTLED (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
July 30, 2018 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED of Settlement - dated 7/20/18 |
||
July 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #005) Motion Term 81 APS (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
July 09, 2018 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 28, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #005) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
June 19, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #5) EBT TRANSCRIPT Redacted per 22 NYCRR EBT TRANSCRIPT Redacted |
||
June 19, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #5) BILL OF PARTICAULRS Redacted per 22 NYCRR BILL OF PARTICAULRS Redacted |
||
June 19, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #5) AFF DR.SETTON Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFF DR.SETTON Redacted |
||
June 19, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #5) AFF DR.APRIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.