Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
M. A. An Infant By Mother And Natural Guardian, Delilah Villanueva, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Weiner, Jeffrey I., against 119 Realty Enterprises, L.L.C., represented by Goldman, Bonnie Sue, Maxwell, Joel Michael, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Kenneth P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time973 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 11, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 05, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2020 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
August 19, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Updated Offer Letter |
||
August 19, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Affirmation of Doctor |
||
August 19, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Infant |
||
August 19, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Mother and Natural Guardian |
||
August 19, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Retainer Agreement |
||
August 19, 2019 | INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
August 19, 2019 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 12, 2018 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 15, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Settlement Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Settlement Agreement Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.