Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Corey Straker, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Barenbaum, Bryan, against East Coast Restoration & Construction Consulting Corp., Rafal Kucharczyk, represented by Hollander, Jeffrey J, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Ellen M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllen M Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time376 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 02, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 25, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 15, 2016ANSWER
Date: September 28, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
July 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled - Other CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Spodek, Hon. Ellen M. |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 11/10/15 filed CC 11/13/15 |
|
November 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Spodek, Hon. Ellen M. |
|
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER ANS with Demands |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING authorization |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit |
|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING authorization |
|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.