Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Oton Ortega, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Silva, George, against Sandra Monica Harris, Winston Wilson, represented by Levine, Jennifer P, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Johnny Lee Baynes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohnny Lee Baynes Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1211 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: August 13, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 14, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2018 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) INTAKE PART ST/DISC (Conversion) Judge: Baynes, Hon. Johnny Lee |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
October 31, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned INTAKE PART Judge: Baynes, Hon. Johnny Lee |
|
October 03, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned INTAKE PART Judge: Baynes, Hon. Johnny Lee |
|
September 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
August 17, 2018 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #001) Decided: 09/07/2018Withdrawn Before Justice: Central Compliance Part, Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Redacted |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Redacted |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Ninety-Day Notice |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.