Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sergio Requez, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Davydov, Denis David, against Quinones L Cardona, Sunset Park Transportation Inc., represented by Moskovits, Ronit Z, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Wavny Toussaint presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWavny Toussaint Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time371 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 24, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2015ANSWER
Date: December 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
June 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) Conference Part 70 STIP/DISC W/PREJ (Conversion) Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
December 24, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS |
|
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.