Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barcsansky, Angelica Marie, Goldberg, Ryan Craig, against Perloff Physical Therapy, P.C., represented by Javakov, Zara, Tarasova, Victoria, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Carl J Landicino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarl J Landicino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 04, 2020ANSWER
Date: July 08, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 25, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 30, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 02, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2022SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: March 31, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2022THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: February 25, 2021NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: March 31, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 10, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: March 31, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) Plaintiff EBT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 21, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 10, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 10, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 21, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 16, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 27, 2021NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: August 26, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 21, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: February 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 21, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 21, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 27, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 27, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 28, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 25, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: October 28, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 29, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 09/21/2022 |
||
September 16, 2022 |
CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #2) WORD COUNT CERTIFICATION |
||
September 16, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) REPLY AFFIRMATION |
||
August 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel |
||
August 19, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Complaint with exhibits |
||
August 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) EXHIBIT E- COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER 7.30.21 |
||
August 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) EXHIBIT C- BILL OF PARTICULARS |
||
August 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) EXHIBIT B- ANSWER |
||
August 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) EXHIBIT A- SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
||
August 10, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS- MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.