Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Us Bank National Association, As Trustee For Sasco Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-Rf4, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Coppola, Meredith Allyn, Di Caro, John A, Medina, Christopher E., Prinz, Christal S., Rugino, Edward, (total of 7) See All against Adverlight Collections, Inc., Jean Routechil Etien A K A Jean Routechil Etienne, Jean V Cleophat, John And Jane Does, New York City Environmental Control Board, (total of 10) See All represented by Pierre, Abel L, Schwartz, Beth Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Dear-For.Resolution Pt 1 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDear-For.Resolution Pt 1 Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1078 days |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1078 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: May 20, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)
Date: May 20, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 29, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #5)
Date: February 25, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 29, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #5)
Date: February 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 29, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: August 23, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #5)
Date: February 25, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #5)
Date: March 21, 2019JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: December 13, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 03, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 07, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 17, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 27, 2014ORDER - OTHER (Motion #5)
Date: April 16, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: July 25, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 21, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 20, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 08, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 10, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 15, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #3)
Date: August 23, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 04, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 11, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 29, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 21, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2013ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 16, 2016ANSWER
Date: February 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT OF PAYMENT INTO COURT RECEIPT #5014 $43,523.45 |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | |
January 02, 2020 | Hearing |
FORECLOSURE SURPLUS FUNDS PART
Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
July 11, 2019 | Hearing |
Held FORECLOSURE AUCTION PART 266 E.2 (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #5) Order To Extend Time etc. dated 04/04/2019 |
|
April 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #005) For. Resolution Part1-Motion NA DEFT (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
March 28, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #005) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.