Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
In The Matter Of The Application Of Country-Wide Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jaskot, Katherine M., Scoll, Svetlana, against Allstate Insurance Company, Frances Washington, Shamiek Engram, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Debra Silber presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra Silber Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time93 days |
PETITION
Date: December 31, 2013NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001)
Date: December 31, 2013STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: April 02, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 9 PETITION WDN, PER STIP (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
March 06, 2014 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 9 STIP (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation of Adjournment |
|
January 30, 2014 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) MOTION PART Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
January 14, 2014 | Motion |
Compel Arbitration (Motion #001) Decided: 04/03/2014Closed Before Justice: Silber, Hon. Debra Answer demanded: No Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | petition to stay arbitration | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) notice of petition |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D exhibit D |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C exhibit C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.