Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Successor By Merger To Wachovia Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Wallace, Lisa L, against Alexander Gofman A Ka Alexander Gotman, Fia Card Services, N.A., Galina Gofman, John Doe #1" To "John Doe #10, Jpmorgan Chase Bank, (total of 5) See All represented by Di Caro, John A, Melita, James Peter, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Dear-For.Resolution Pt 1 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDear-For.Resolution Pt 1 Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1693 days |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time1884 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 02, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2019 | NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
April 18, 2019 |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 2/27/19 |
||
February 27, 2019 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003) For. Resolution Part1-Motion NA DEFT (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
January 10, 2019 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 10, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 10, 2019 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) filed by MXT 20152609 |
||
January 10, 2019 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #003) Decided: 02/27/2019Closed Before Justice: Dear, Hon. Noach Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
January 09, 2019 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #002) For. Resolution Part1-Motion BY MOVT (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
January 04, 2019 |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2) FILED BY CNW 20152609 |
||
October 24, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) For. Resolution Part1-Motion FINAL (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.