Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Roc Atlantic Innovative Holdings Corp., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Pistor, Andrew Charles, Ruderman, Jeffrey C, Schwartz, James E, against 2276 Atlantic Llc, Gregory Reid, John Doe, represented by Grossman, Floyd G, Mandell, Eric J, Wiederkehr, Lee S., in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time787 days |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: April 10, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 27, 2014REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: April 16, 2014STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: February 26, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 10, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 09, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: March 24, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER (AMENDED) | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.