Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ka Yi Wong, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Liu, Stanley C., Wong, Andy On-Tik, against Feng Hua Kong Aka Wendy Kong, Jane Doe, Joe Joe, John Doe, Yuda Inc D B A Jblu Spa, (total of 5) See All represented by Hsu, Allen Y., in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCommercial |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: January 27, 2014RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 25, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2021 | Hearing |
INTAKE PART
Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.