Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lakesha Williams, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Miller, Sara, against Judith E. Bartlett, Mary E. Montgomary, represented by Jacques, Debora L, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Mark I. Partnow (Pt. 43) presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark I. Partnow (Pt. 43) Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time753 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 10, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 10, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 22, 2016ANSWER
Date: March 10, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 08/13/14, Filed KCC 01/08/16 nsp |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST REQUEST FOR PC |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.