Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Yan Khankin, Yevgeniya Khankin, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Tsyngauz, Yevgeny, against Aleksandr Gorbenko, John Does 1-10, Mayya Dobrova, represented by Tannenbaum, Eliot Barry, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Bernard J. Graham, Pt 36 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBernard J. Graham, Pt 36 Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time466 days |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: September 30, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 25, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED of Discontinuance dated 4/7/15 filed CC 4/8/15 |
|
April 07, 2015 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) PART 36 STIP OF DISCT 4/7/15 (Conversion) Judge: Graham, Hon. Bernard J. |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 6514(d) | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Canceling Notice of Pendency |
|
February 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Marked Off (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 36 Judge: Graham, Hon. Bernard J. |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) | |
January 23, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) MOTION PART Judge: Graham, Hon. Bernard J. |
|
January 09, 2015 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #001) Decided: 02/05/2015Granted Before Justice: Graham, Hon. Bernard J. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Graham, Hon. Bernard J. |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Alan Blumen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.