Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc., Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-Ar5, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Femminella, Nicole P, against Board Of Managers Of The Landings At Fresh Creek Condominium I, Gaston Stephenson, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, (total of 6) See All represented by Mohen, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Donald S. Kurtz (Pt.26) presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald S. Kurtz (Pt.26) Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time347 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2013AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) dated 12/9/14 filed CC 12/15/14 |
|
December 09, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 26 Judge: Kurtz, Hon. Donald Scott |
|
December 08, 2014 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 26 Judge: Kurtz, Hon. Donald Scott |
|
November 17, 2014 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #001) Decided: 12/09/2014Closed Before Justice: Kurtz, Hon. Donald Scott Answer demanded: No Judge: Kurtz, Hon. Donald Scott |
|
October 20, 2014 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Kurtz, Hon. Donald Scott |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.