Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Oocl, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Meyers, Irwin, against Ok To Ship Inc., represented by Novofastovsky, Ilya, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Kathy King presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathy King Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1494 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: April 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: April 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: February 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2018 | Hearing |
Settled PART 64 N.J. TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: King, Hon. Kathy J. |
|
October 05, 2017 | Hearing |
NON-JURY TRIAL READINESS PART TRIAL F (Conversion) Judge: Non-Jury Trial Readiness Part, |
|
October 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned PART 64 N.J. TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: King, Hon. Kathy J. |
|
September 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned NON-JURY TRIAL READINESS PART TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: Non-Jury Trial Readiness Part, |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY of Order |
|
July 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) NON-JURY TRIAL READINESS PART Judge: Non-Jury Trial Readiness Part, |
|
July 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned NON-JURY TRIAL READINESS PART MOTION (Conversion) Judge: Non-Jury Trial Readiness Part, |
|
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.