Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Srp 2012-4, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Falkowski, Michal, Richland, Daniel H, Richland, Daniel H., against Me Me Nwe, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Wavny Toussaint presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWavny Toussaint Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2015 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions544 days |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time764 days |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #1)
Date: December 30, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 11, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 13, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: December 30, 2016JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: December 30, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: July 05, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry, Judgment, and Affirmation of Service | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
August 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) DEFAULT JUDGMENT PT 1-INQUEST J.G. (Conversion) Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK (Motion #1) | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #1) Notice of Settlement |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affirmation of Service |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
BILL OF COSTS (Motion #1) Bill of Costs |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Judgment |
|
December 19, 2016 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #001) DEFAULT JUDGMENT PART 1 GSON (Conversion) Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.