Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Robert F Codrington Ii, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Adeyinka, Oluwatosin O., Prakhin, Yuriy, against Samuel Churcher, represented by Moskovits, Ronit Z, Schioppi, Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Johnny Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohnny Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1302 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: June 11, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 30, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: November 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2020 | Hearing |
Denied (Motion #002) Motion Term 95 Judge: Boddie, Hon. Reginald A. |
|
July 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Boddie, Hon. Reginald A. |
|
July 07, 2020 | Motion |
Vacate - Decision/Order/Judgment/Award (Motion #002) Decided: 10/22/2020Denied Before Justice: Boddie, Hon. Reginald A. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Boddie, Hon. Reginald A. |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Affirmation In Opposition |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Note of issue |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Order dated 12/11/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.