Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Triumph Capital Partners, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Tarab, Margaret Burke, against John Doe No. I To John Doe No. X, Inclusive, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Ruperto Torres Jr, Torres International, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: March 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
April 26, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RUPERTO TORRES, JR.- AMENDED AOS |
||
March 25, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-ANY AND ALL DOES -47136983 |
||
March 25, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RUPERTO TORRES, JR. - AOS |
||
March 09, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-TORRES INTERNATIONAL, LLC.-46996934 |
||
March 09, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
||
March 09, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE-47002092 |
||
February 24, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.