Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lalita Crews, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Ramirez, Ronald W, against 1040 Kfc Llc, Jam Services And Repairs Llc, Jose M. Nina Bonilla, Kfc Corporation, Qsr East Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Gardiner, Laura Beth, Organek, Megan Furrer, Salvato, Richard Anthony, Spencer, Sean Michael, Thompson, Rhonda Diane, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Montelione presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Montelione Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Injury On Deft Premises) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 21, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER final pre note dated 2/1/23 |
||
January 31, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Final Pre-Note Order |
||
January 05, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to KFC Corp. D&I |
||
November 09, 2022 | Notice of Entry and Order | ||
November 04, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) dtd 11/2/22 |
||
September 29, 2022 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Firm Name |
||
September 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) S&C and our Answer |
||
September 01, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Aff in Support with word count cert |
||
September 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) emls re discontinuance |
||
September 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Lease, Assign, Assump |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.