Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Anthony Nowlin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ferrante, Anthony A., Koenig, Jeffrey L, against Edy A. Rodriguez, Luis C. Hurtado-Taymes, represented by Scahill, Francis J, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Lara Genovesi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLara Genovesi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: April 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 15, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 19, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 01, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 15, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
April 15, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 15, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
April 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 19, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 24, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.