Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arlene Costa, D S An Infant By Her Mother And Natural Guardian Meccah Costa, Meccah Costa, M P An Infant By Her Mother And Natural Guardian Teionna Costa, Teionna Costa, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kong, Toni Karmin, Kubick, Richard Anton, against Lyft, Inc., Nyahashanti Dawkins, Xin Zhang, represented by Ensslin, Sasha Jillian, Moskovits, Ronit Z, Rosenthal, David Lorrin, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Robin Sheares presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin Sheares Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Expert Witness Disclosure 3101 (d) |
||
June 30, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS |
||
June 30, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 15, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
June 09, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected* FCP 6.13.23 |
||
March 13, 2023 |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Notice to Withdraw Motion |
||
March 07, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS PURSUANT TO CPLR 3101(d) |
||
March 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) RESPONSE TO 10/27/22 DEMAND |
||
March 03, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
February 17, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.