Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Joseph Guido, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Grandelli, Louis, against Jose Ochoa, Santos Collazo, represented by Alahverdian, Erick Krikor, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Delores Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDelores Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 29, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated 6/28/22 |
||
March 01, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Executed Stip of Disc. |
||
October 29, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 06, 2021 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for PC |
||
October 06, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 28, 2021 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
July 28, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
June 29, 2021 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
June 17, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Ochoa Affidavit of Service |
||
April 27, 2021 | Affidavit of Service - Collazo |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.