Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cranes Express Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cheng, Meng, Mastrogiannis, William Aristotle, Zisholtz, Stuart Shalom, against Ibk Construction Group Llc, represented by Weiner, Bruce Laurence, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Kings Njtrp presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKings Njtrp Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021ANSWER
Date: April 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of service |
||
May 03, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry |
||
April 25, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to defendant per court |
||
April 24, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) Dated April 19, 2023 |
||
January 13, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Letter to court |
||
November 15, 2022 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
October 14, 2022 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #3) SIGNED OSC |
||
August 16, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 16, 2022 | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | ||
August 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.