Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ct Steel, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Malik, Suleman, Regan, Todd R., Trunkes, Virginia Kristina, against Desales Media Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Kenny, Michael Leo, Wright, Ethan Abel, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Reginald Boddie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReginald Boddie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 19, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 21, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 9/21/2022 |
||
August 30, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 8/29/2022 |
||
August 30, 2022 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
August 18, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 8/16/2022 |
||
July 29, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Suleman Malik in Support of Motion to Extend |
||
July 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) CT Steel Request for PC |
||
July 29, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 29, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Virginia K. Trunkes in Support of Motion to Extend |
||
July 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) CT Steel's First Set of Discovery Requests |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.