Case Last Refreshed: 21 hours ago
Jane Doe, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Ruta, Joseph A, against Abigail Mensah N.P., Meera Shah M.D., Planned Parenthood Hudson Peconic, Inc., A New York Corporation, D B A Planned Parenthood Spring Valley Health Center, And Planned Parenhood White Plains Health Center, represented by Fox, Kenneth Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Ellen M. Spodek presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllen M. Spodek Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings. The plaintiff, Jane Doe, is suing Meera Shah, M.D., Abigail Mensah, N.P., Planned Parenthood Hudson Peconic, Inc., and Planned Parenthood White Plains Health Cen...
ORDER - SEALING
Date: May 11, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 10, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 25, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: January 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 20, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 20, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: January 20, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2021 |
ORDER - SEALING Sealed |
||
May 06, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Sealed |
||
February 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Sealed |
||
January 25, 2021 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1) Sealed |
||
January 20, 2021 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Sealed |
||
January 20, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Sealed |
||
January 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Sealed |
||
January 20, 2021 |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Sealed |
||
January 20, 2021 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Sealed |
||
January 20, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Sealed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.