Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sm Financial Services Corporation Assignee Of David P. Leibowitz, Trustee, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stein, William M, against Dessalines Sealy D B A Free, Calm And Growing, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Velasquez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Velasquez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ANSWER
Date: September 02, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 25, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Good Faith Letter |
||
November 04, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affidavit in support of motion to vacate default judgment |
||
November 04, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected* Notice of motion to vacate default judgment |
||
November 04, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in support of motion to vacate default judgment |
||
November 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - ABC (Motion #2) Default judgment, paystubs, and copy of agreement |
||
October 14, 2022 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY NOTICE OF ISSUE |
||
September 20, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY |
||
September 20, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
September 19, 2022 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #1) Dated: September 15, 2022 |
||
August 25, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4) dtd 8/18/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.