Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Successor By Merger To Wachovia Mortgage, Fsb, Formerly Known As World Savings Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, against Bankers Trust Company Of California, Na As Trustee Under The Pooling And Servicing Agreement Dated As Of March 27, 1997 Delta Funding Home Equity Loan Trust 1997-1, Capital One Bank, City Of New York Department Of Finance Parking Violations Bureau, City Of New York Environmental Control Board, City Of New York Transit Adjudication Bureau, (total of 9) See All represented by Tordesillas, Bernard James, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Noach Dear presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNoach Dear Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2013 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 01, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: October 15, 2013LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #7) filed by KRH |
||
November 18, 2022 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
October 07, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #7) Filed by CAB |
||
September 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 19, 2022 |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #6) filed by bmb |
||
September 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #7) supplemental documents |
||
September 16, 2022 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
September 16, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 16, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
September 16, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #7) *Corrected* filed by bmb |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.