Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Manfredi, Linda P., Mullane, George James, Tremaroli, Robert Steven, against Eswal Ewart, Joseph D. Eastman, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Cenceria Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCenceria Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2011 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 18, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: May 25, 2011EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 21, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 18, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: November 23, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
November 23, 2022 | NOTIFICATION FROM COURT | ||
October 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #7) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale Redacted |
||
October 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #7) Summons, Complaint and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR Summons, Complaint and Notice of Pendency Redacted |
||
October 18, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 18, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
October 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 18, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #7) Non Service |
||
October 18, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 02, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.