Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Lehman Brothers-Structured Asset Securities Corporation Sasco 2007- Bnc1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Brooklyn Union Gas Keyspan Energy Delivery, Morlisa Sergeant, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau, Palisades Collection Llc, (total of 8) See All represented by George, Glenroy Michael, Tordesillas, Bernard James, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Cenceria Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCenceria Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 08, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing for Notice of Conversion to Electronic Filing |
||
August 15, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Affirmation in Reply |
||
August 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) B- Order |
||
August 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) A- Copy of The Motion Cover age |
||
June 30, 2022 |
NOTICE OF REJECTION (Motion #1) Notice of Rejection |
||
June 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOM for Notice of Rejection |
||
June 29, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
December 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affirmation of Service |
||
December 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) H- Order of Dismissal |
||
December 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) F- Order of Reference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.