Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Silas Agbim As Administrator Of The Estate Of Patricia Ngozi Agbim, Deceased, Silas Agbim As Administrator Of The Estate Of Patricia Ngozi Agbim, Deceased, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against The New York City Department Of Transportation, The City Of New York, represented by Katsaros, Rodianna Olympia, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Reginald A. Boddie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReginald A. Boddie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2014 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
||
March 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 22 Judge: Boddie, Hon. Reginald A. |
|
March 15, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) MOTION TRIAL TERM 22 Judge: REGINALD A. BODDIE, PT. 22 |
|
February 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) MOTION PART Judge: Boddie, Hon. Reginald A. |
|
February 25, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART Judge: REGINALD A. BODDIE, PT. 22 |
|
January 11, 2019 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #001) Decided: 03/15/2019Withdrawn Before Justice: Boddie, Hon. Reginald A. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Boddie, Hon. Reginald A. |
|
January 11, 2019 | Motion |
DISMISSAL (Motion #001) Decided: 03/15/2019MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: REGINALD A. BODDIE, PT. 22 Answer demanded: Yes Judge: REGINALD A. BODDIE, PT. 22 |
|
September 24, 2014 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.