Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. F K A The Bank Of New York Trust Company, N.A. As Trustee For Chase Mortgage Finance Trust Multi-Class Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-S3, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cheverko, Geraldine A, against Eyya Realty Corp, Flushing Savings Bank, Fsb, John Barone, Mr Lee, Mrs Lee, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Noach Dear presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNoach Dear Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2013 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 23, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: July 02, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
April 21, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing - Notice of Sale |
||
November 18, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #6) dtd 11/16/2022 |
||
November 17, 2022 |
APPELLATE COURT DECISION/ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) dated 10/26/22 |
||
October 27, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 29, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 29, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
June 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #6) Courts order, with notice of entry |
||
June 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #6) Summons, Complaint and Notice of Pendency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.