Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Rothenberg, Hon. Karen B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRothenberg, Hon. Karen B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2016 |
CategoryTort-Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time556 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART CCP (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
August 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Marked Off (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART NAM (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
August 01, 2017 | Motion |
Strike Pleadings (Motion #001) Decided: 08/18/2017Granted Before Justice: Central Compliance Part, Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
February 03, 2017 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) NOTE OF ISSUE/NO APPEARANCE 1ST STI (Conversion) Judge: Rothenberg, Hon. Karen B. |
|
December 02, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE/NO APPEARANCE Judge: Rothenberg, Hon. Karen B. |
|
August 12, 2016 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Rothenberg, Hon. Karen B. |
|
February 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Rothenberg, Hon. Karen B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.